THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:22:13 PM
Robertson, Sharman Joanne
CPSO#:
67951
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Medical Protective
Association
875 Carling Ave Ottawa On
K1S 5 P1
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Phone: 613-725-2000
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sharman J. Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 17 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Jul 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARMAN JOANNE ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2000 to 31 Jul 2001
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2000 |