THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 14:26:31 PM
Marquardt, Hans Roy
CPSO#:
67944
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
61 5th Street
Englehart & District Hospital
Englehart ON P0J 1H0
Phone: 705-544-2301
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Marquardt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 17 2012
Corporation Name: Marquardt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 30 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Englehart and District Hospital |
Englehart |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
North Shore Health Network |
Blind River |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HANS ROY MARQUARDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARQUARDT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1996 |