THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:35:18 PM
Sapp, Margaret Michelle
CPSO#:
67925
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jan 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58401
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARGARET MICHELLE SAPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAPP is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2004 |