THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:02:11 AM
Filippone, Daniela Giuseppina Serafina
CPSO#:
67903
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
845 Regent Street South
Suite 105
Sudbury ON P3E 4T3
Phone: (705) 674-7481
Fax: (705) 674-7113
Electoral District: 08
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIELA GIUSEPPINA SERAFINA FILIPPONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILIPPONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1999 |