THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:37:22 PM
Hermant, Tammy Gail
CPSO#:
67902
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602
110 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON M4P 2Y1
Phone: (416) 486-3300
Fax: (416) 486-9433
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAMMY GAIL HERMANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERMANT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1996 |