THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:45:32 AM
Kwon, Janice Smith
CPSO#:
67898
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Oct 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Kwon, Janice Sugie (used until: 13 Feb 2002 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Janice Kwon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2007
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2007 |