THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:15:17 AM
Rosta, Neil Iain Nandor
CPSO#:
67897
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
P O Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: (519) 372-3954
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brightshores Health System |
Owen Sound |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Hanover and District Hospital |
Hanover |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEIL IAIN NANDOR ROSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1996 |