THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:46:49 PM
Lemieux, Camille Marie
CPSO#:
67894
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 May 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 May 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300-440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S6
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAMILLE MARIE LEMIEUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMIEUX is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Jul 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2002 |