THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 20:21:33 PM
Tiessen, Ingrid Marilyn
CPSO#:
67876
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 May 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 May 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Carleton University HCS
Suite 2600 CTTC Building
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
Phone: (613) 520-6674
Fax: 613-520-3851
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 May 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. INGRID MARILYN TIESSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIESSEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 04 May 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 05 May 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 01 May 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 May 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2000 |