THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:43:41 AM
Britten, Heather Frances
CPSO#:
67870
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Teen Health Centre
101-1361 Ouellette Ave.
Windsor ON N8X 1J6
Phone: (519) 253-8481
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER FRANCES BRITTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRITTEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Nov 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Dec 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 1996 |