THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:50:25 AM
Lindsay, Christopher Sean
CPSO#:
67854
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Oct 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Oct 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
20 Charles Street
Newmarket ON L3Y 3V8
Phone: (905) 830-9797
Fax: (905) 830-5107
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Chris S. Lindsay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 6 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: May 8, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On May 3rd, 2023, Southlake Regional Health Centre notified the College, pursuant to s.33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code (Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act), that Dr. Christopher Sean Lindsay's hospital privileges have been suspended as of May 8th, 2023 to July 7th, 2023, due to conduct concerns.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER SEAN LINDSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDSAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 1999 |