THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:17:38 AM
Yip, Lisa Y-Yee
CPSO#:
67850
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
10 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
10-Mar-2023
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology |
Effective:01 Nov 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 10 Mar 2023 |