THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:56:03 PM
Mueller, Valerie Margaret Laidlaw
CPSO#:
67803
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
108-24 Queens Sq
Clinic
Cambridge ON N1S 1H6
Phone: 647-505-9421
Fax: 855-267-1382
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:03 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VALERIE MARGARET LAIDLAW MUELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUELLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 06 Nov 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 07 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2003 |