THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 8:09:08 AM
Lock, Michael Ian
CPSO#:
67799
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jan 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jan 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Radiation Oncology
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL IAN LOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 1999 |