THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:42:50 PM
Hobbs, Cynthia Anne
CPSO#:
67796
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Oct 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: 7057432121 Ext. 3961
Fax: 705-876-5836
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:19 Nov 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CYNTHIA ANNE HOBBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOBBS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 19 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2015 |