THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:21:25 AM
Woulfe, John Michael Joseph
CPSO#:
67777
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13345
Fax: (613) 761-4199
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Lalonde Woulfe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neuropathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL JOSEPH WOULFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOULFE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1998 |