THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:26:14 AM
Sinuff, Tasnim
CPSO#:
67758
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sinuff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 26 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Sunnybrook Health Sceinces Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 11 Jul 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:26 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Clinician Investigator
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Clinician Investigator
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Clinician Investigator
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jul 2019 |