THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:51:03 PM
Chong, Karen Lynn Elizabeth
CPSO#:
67754
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Feb 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Ontario Power Generation Building
700 University Avenue
Room 3-710
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4523
Fax: (416) 586-4723
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:02 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREN LYNN ELIZABETH CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 1999 |