THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:49:41 PM
Tjong, Joshua Kuo-Koewang
CPSO#:
67750
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Indonesian, Mandarin
Education: University of Calgary, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: 705-759-3434 Ext. 6889
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSHUA KUO-KOEWANG TJONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TJONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |