THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 7:30:24 AM
McArthur, Anne-Louise Andrea
CPSO#:
67745
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4053
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNE-LOUISE ANDREA MCARTHUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCARTHUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1996 |