THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:02:45 AM
Wong, Jason Hon Pun
CPSO#:
67730
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Queen's University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Court Medical Offices
Suite 314
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 287-8303
Fax: (416) 287-3239
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JASON HON PUN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1999 |