THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:31:53 PM
Walsh, Jennifer
CPSO#:
67729
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Cochrane, Jennifer (used until: 26 Aug 2004 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 6589
Fax: (905) 845-3376
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:31 May 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER WALSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Nov 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 01 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2000 |