THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:47:19 AM
Skehan, Anthony Michael
CPSO#:
67689
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
C/O Operating Room Desk
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: 8073468015
Electoral District: 09
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Docudavit Solutions Inc.
Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 07 Feb 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: September 6, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On February 15, 2012, Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre notified the College that Dr. Anthony Michael Skehan's privileges were restricted, effective September 6, 2011.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:28 May 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY MICHAEL SKEHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKEHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2000 |