THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:46:25 PM
Walsh-Bergin, Paula
CPSO#:
67675
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre,
COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH PROGRAM
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 7370
Fax: (613) 739-8400
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAULA WALSH-BERGIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH-BERGIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 12 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 13 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 07 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Feb 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2000 |