THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:49:21 AM
Arrazaghi, Abdelwahab Ahmed Alsed
CPSO#:
67643
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
1920 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON M1H 2V6
Phone: (416) 438-8667
Fax: (416) 438-6358
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:12 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDELWAHAB AHMED ALSED ARRAZAGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARRAZAGHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 05 Feb 2001
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Feb 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2002 |