THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:24:58 AM
Huhlewych, Roman Arkadiy
CPSO#:
67594
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
07 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Dec 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Roman Huhlewych Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:502 - 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Toronto, ON M1P 2T7
Date Received: 25 Apr 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Apr 2021 |