THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:05:43 PM
Pirouzmand, Farhad
CPSO#:
67591
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jan 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jan 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Iranian
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite A131
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5263
Fax: (416) 480-6085
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:10 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FARHAD PIROUZMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIROUZMAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 28 Nov 1994
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 29 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 29 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 28 Nov 1995
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 29 Nov 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Nov 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 29 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2003 |