THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:20:07 AM
Seidelin, Peter Harald
CPSO#:
67565
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Mar 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Mar 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
EN-6 234A
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4930
Fax: (416) 340-3865
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER HARALD SEIDELIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIDELIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1993 to 31 Oct 1994
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Feb 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Mar 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 1996 |