THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 3:19:45 AM
Ibrahim, Moheb Samir
CPSO#:
67564
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Sep 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Asyut University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Estern Ontar
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:31 Dec 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHEB SAMIR IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 29 Aug 1994
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2002 |