THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 22:18:43 PM
Reddick, Deborah Susan
CPSO#:
67512
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Dec 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Dec 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bayfield Treatment Centres
30 Country Road 39
Consecon Ontario KOK ITO
Toronto ON K0K 1T0
Phone: 613 392 3551 Ext. 227
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:18 Nov 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH SUSAN REDDICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDICK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Oct 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Dec 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 1999 |