THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:17:46 AM
Kalaichandran, Sivasamboo
CPSO#:
67510
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Kannada, Tamil
Education: Mysore University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kalaichandran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:16 Sep 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Sep 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 1995 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 6, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sivasamboo Kalaichandran to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 6, 2015:
Dr. Kalaichandran was the subject of a College investigation into whether he fell below the standard of practice of the profession. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Kalaichandran must not perform surgery or colposcopy. Dr. Kalaichandran will also complete a course satisfactory to the College in medical record keeping.