THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:24:13 AM
Alhashemi, Jamal Abdulwali Mohammed Abdulhaq
CPSO#:
67440
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore General Hospital
160 Avenue Stillview
Pointe Claire QC H9R 2Y2
Phone: (514) 630-2225
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jamal A. Alhashemi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 19 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMAL ABDULWALI MOHAMMED ABDULHAQ ALHASHEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHASHEMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2014 |