THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 11:19:39 AM
Bami, Harmeet Kaur
CPSO#:
67404
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Aug 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Delhi, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Suite 1423
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6695
Fax: (905) 494-6710
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 Aug 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HARMEET KAUR BAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 12 Aug 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1997 |