THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:24:07 PM
Tan, King Wi Andre
CPSO#:
67382
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Aug 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
307A Bridge Street West
Napanee ON K7R 3V3
Phone: (613) 409-8888
Fax: (613) 409-8889
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: September 7, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On September 1, 2010, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. King Wi Andre Tan's privileges for the care of paediatric patients were temporarily suspended, effective September 1, 2010.
On September 7, 2010, Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston notified the College that Dr. King W.A. Tan's privileges for the care of paediatric ENT patients were temporarily suspended, effective September 7, 2010. On October 27, 2010, Dr. Tan's elective paediatric privileges were restored with supervision and monitoring.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:08 Sep 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1993 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 14 Nov 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 14 Nov 2012 |
|
Active |