THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 20:01:43 PM
Kyrollos, Maggy Georges Halim
CPSO#:
67367
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAGGY GEORGES HALIM KYROLLOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYROLLOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 24 Sep 1998
Resident 4 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Sep 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1999 |