THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:47:05 PM
Bendago, Mansour Mustafa
CPSO#:
67366
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Nov 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
414-2863 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 5E9
Phone: 416 284 4420
Fax: 416 284 5543
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:29 Aug 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANSOUR MUSTAFA BENDAGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENDAGO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Jan 1996
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1999 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: December 6, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)