THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:29:24 AM
Szumacher, Ewa Franciszka
CPSO#:
67360
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Sep 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Sep 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue North
North York ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6000 Ext. 2802
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:23 Jul 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EWA FRANCISZKA SZUMACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZUMACHER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 23 Jul 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jul 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 1997 |