THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:37:05 AM
Clase, Catherine Mary
CPSO#:
67344
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cambridge School of Clinic, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6094
Fax: (905) 521-6153
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:06 Sep 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY CLASE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLASE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 1993 to 03 Sep 1993
EL - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Nephrology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Sep 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1995 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2001 |