THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:00:24 PM
Douglas, Simone Ann
CPSO#:
67288
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Aug 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
955 Major MacKenzie Drive
Vaughan ON L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 832-2201
Fax: (905) 832-2246
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIMONE ANN DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Aug 1993 to 02 Aug 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 03 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1995 |