THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 10:05:13 AM
Clarke, Theresa-Ann
CPSO#:
67278
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Clarke Maharaj, Theresa-Ann (used until: 23 Apr 1996 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
241 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON N3T 3J4
Phone: (519) 753-3310
Fax: (519) 753-7618
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THERESA-ANN CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1993 to 31 Mar 1994
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1993 |