THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:42:17 PM
Vaithianathan, Kandiah
CPSO#:
67276
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Colombo, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Not in Practice
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. K. Vaithianathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 14 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:109-1200 Markham Road
Scarborough, Ontario. MlH 3C3.
Telephone Number: 416-438-2496
Fax Number: 416-438-8290
Date Received: 22 Jul 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Oct 2021 |