THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:07:53 AM
Hussain, Nadeem Ayaz
CPSO#:
67271
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Urdu
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Health Center
268 Grosvenor Street
Room B0-692
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Ext. 64312
Fax: (519) 646-6130
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Nadeem Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 21 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:06 Oct 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADEEM AYAZ HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Nov 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 1997 |