THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:34:50 PM
Magar, Janice Diane
CPSO#:
67270
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Legere, Janice Diane (used until: 05 Mar 1996 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 286
Dunrobin ON K0A 1T0
Phone: 613 875-2664
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Magar Weisgerber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANICE DIANE MAGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1993 |