THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:13:56 AM
Clark, Heather Diane
CPSO#:
67263
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Room D105
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-5164
Fax: (613) 761-4036
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER DIANE CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1993 |