THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:36:37 AM
Bonin, Brigitte
CPSO#:
67239
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 May 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Room 8476
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8968
Fax: (613) 737-8070
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIGITTE BONIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 1995 |