THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:49:53 PM
Garneys, Glenn Gordon
CPSO#:
67229
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5039
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GLENN GORDON GARNEYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARNEYS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1993 |
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Dec 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1994 |