THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:22:39 PM
Brisebois, Johnny Darren
CPSO#:
67176
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville, Ont
Kemptville ON K0G1J0
Phone: 613-258-3435
Fax: 613-258-1225
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. J. Brisebois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Deep River and District Hospital |
Deep River |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHNNY DARREN BRISEBOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRISEBOIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1995 |