THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:42:29 PM
Sawhney, Gulshan
CPSO#:
67164
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
09 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
9-Sep-2021
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Delhi, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Gulshan Sawhney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2009
Corporation Name: Gulshan Sawhney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 22 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 09 Sep 2021 |