THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:39:33 AM
Patel, Santhya
CPSO#:
67141
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: Mysore University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Santhya Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 23 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:05 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jun 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Oct 1995
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Nov 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2020 |