THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:04:20 AM
Cohodarevic, Tea
CPSO#:
67138
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 May 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English
Education: University of Zagreb, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Tea Cohodarevic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 2 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 May 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2023 |